Financial history FINDON VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1029483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £65.47k £53.90k £50.26k £116.79k £127.16k
Total expenditure £69.55k £58.39k £74.19k £100.39k £124.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A