Financial history FRIENDS OF SPRINGHILL HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1029531
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £5 £5.27k £17 £10 £0
Total expenditure £665 £5.24k £270 £190 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A