Financial history HUMPTY DUMPTY PRE-SCHOOL (CALNE)

Charity number: 1029604
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £132.22k £139.52k £155.24k £121.45k £134.53k
Total expenditure £131.94k £132.90k £154.99k £127.00k £126.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A