Financial history FRIENDS OF MOORLANDS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1029617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.05k £2.77k £3.45k £4.72k £5.15k
Total expenditure £6.57k £5.21k £3.89k £4.25k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A