Accounts and annual returns SPARROWS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1029652
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On Time