Accounts and annual returns HOLY FAMILY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1030000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 July 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 July 2023 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 August 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 August 2022 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 July 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 July 2021 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 September 2020 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 September 2020 66 days late Download Open in new window