Financial history ASH WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1030094
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 31/03/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £2.24k £2.67k £2.79k £3.32k £4.01k
Total expenditure £2.45k £2.59k £2.79k £3.15k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A