Financial history KEMSING SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1030293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £12.43k £10.86k £18.73k £37.54k £30.67k
Total expenditure £554 £301 £12.24k £2.66k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.90k N/A