Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S GREEN PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1030643
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 27 January 2012 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 18 May 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 17 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 22 November 2010 | 145 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 15 September 2009 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 30 March 2010 | 273 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window