Financial history OAKLEY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1030651
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £121.84k £102.41k £318.83k £275.52k £318.20k
Total expenditure £119.76k £120.11k £145.65k £144.67k £338.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.00k £26.00k £154.13k N/A