Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF CHELTENHAM BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1030677
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 23 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 27 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required