Financial history TASK BRASIL-THE ABANDONED STREET KIDS OF BRAZIL TRUST

Charity number: 1030929
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £69.43k £56.83k £74.68k £61.63k £45.93k
Total expenditure £112.45k £74.79k £63.71k £68.90k £79.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.94k N/A N/A