Financial history PENDRAGON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030973
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £58.81k £51.44k £54.99k £49.89k £68.94k
Total expenditure £47.96k £49.35k £56.62k £51.37k £50.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A