Accounts and annual returns THE OCCUPATIONAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL DISEASES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031036
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 21 February 2007 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time