Financial history BROUGHTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1031324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £84.83k £77.04k £83.36k £91.83k £127.61k
Total expenditure £77.62k £74.78k £78.50k £113.95k £95.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.84k N/A N/A N/A