Financial history TAMAR VALLEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1031355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.53k £50.61k £60.90k £64.85k £60.52k
Total expenditure £53.89k £49.32k £55.92k £65.99k £63.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £56.26k £48.58k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A