Financial history CHEADLE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1031518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £69.45k £10.46k £10.89k £16.84k £11.67k
Total expenditure £20.00k £17.89k £20.55k £22.86k £24.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A N/A N/A