Accounts and annual returns ABINGDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU FRIENDS

Charity number: 1031575
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 01 June 2012 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 October 2011 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required