Accounts and annual returns BERKHAMSTED/TRING STROKE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1031589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required