Financial history CWMRHYDYCEIRW HOME/SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031709
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013
Total gross income £7.00k £8.20k £10.48k £6.06k £3.48k
Total expenditure £4.00k £2.53k £1.90k £1.70k £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A