Financial history WESTWOODSIDE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.34k £1.73k £11.25k £13.06k £10.79k
Total expenditure £1.95k £3.87k £3.87k £12.90k £5.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A