Accounts and annual returns SCALLYWAGS 0-5 CLUB

Charity number: 1031920
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 28 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required