Financial history NAVIGATION PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A., ALTRINCHAM

Charity number: 1032092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £21.91k £9.76k £8.64k £9.57k £15.24k
Total expenditure £16.98k £3.58k £3.56k £9.57k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A