Accounts and annual returns WOODLANDS HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1032187
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 11 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 10 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 14 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required