Financial history PENRHYN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1032265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £360.40k £313.46k £275.85k £282.52k £379.44k
Total expenditure £368.48k £313.79k £314.48k £325.51k £363.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £282.52k £379.44k
Income from government grants N/A £187.93k £124.39k N/A N/A