Financial history ST ANDREWS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1032316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £5.05k £5.46k £7.57k £11.71k £14.42k
Total expenditure £12.82k £17.11k £12.87k £17.24k £9.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A