Trustees FRIENDS OF BINSTED SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Pedder Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Rebecca Strathearn-Knight Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Henry J Jennings Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Anna Hruskova Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Joyce Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Caroline Thompson Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Michelle H Stephens Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Aimee Macleod Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Kerry Wilson Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record