Financial history GORRAN PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1032416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £70.69k £89.67k £93.84k £96.31k £108.43k
Total expenditure £71.21k £80.51k £95.49k £90.62k £93.67k
Income from government contracts £51.09k £46.02k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £57.77k N/A £75.59k