Financial history BRITISH SUNDIAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1032530
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £53.50k £32.67k £47.74k £49.21k £50.91k
Total expenditure £47.68k £39.61k £47.00k £54.43k £43.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A