Financial history THOMAS ALLEYNE'S HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1032539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.60k £1.26k £2.41k £1.90k £3.33k
Total expenditure £186 £3.39k £1.75k £2.10k £2.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A