Accounts and annual returns CATTERICK YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1032542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 25 July 2024 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required