Accounts and annual returns PLATFORM 3 PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1032597

Charity reporting is up to date (138 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 December 2022 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2024 | 634 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window