Financial history GRASSHOPPER CLUB

Charity number: 1032694
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £207.30k £216.85k £181.72k £211.61k £191.85k
Total expenditure £200.49k £174.22k £189.91k £211.89k £225.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £174.00k £95.43k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A