Financial history ST LEONARDS SCHOOL IPSTONES PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1033239
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £836 £1.99k £3.26k £4.18k £1.44k
Total expenditure £1.28k £1.90k £2.64k £4.50k £2.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A