Accounts and annual returns NEWDIGATE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033332
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 March 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 February 2022 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 February 2022 382 days late
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 August 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 August 2020 202 days late
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On Time