Accounts and annual returns CULLINGWORTH PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1033547
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 31 January 2005 On Time