Financial history LYDD HOUSE PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1033875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44.23k £66.33k £67.91k £85.42k £61.64k
Total expenditure £58.98k £67.31k £73.63k £74.89k £71.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A