Accounts and annual returns STOCKTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1033877
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 10 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 02 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 07 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 19 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2005 25 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 02 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 02 December 2004 On Time