Financial history SHIPTON BELLINGER PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1034047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £78.24k £118.20k £101.22k £142.22k £165.48k
Total expenditure £86.48k £102.19k £96.29k £125.20k £165.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A