Financial history SHEPTON MALLET WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1034449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.41k £1.42k £1.62k £2.75k £4.59k
Total expenditure £2.18k £1.19k £1.82k £2.61k £4.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A