Accounts and annual returns WAKEFIELD ONCOLOGY LEUKAEMIA FUND (W.O.L.F.)

Charity number: 1034649
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 August 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2021 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2021 334 days late Download Open in new window