Financial history ST JOSEPH'S PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.59k £4.15k £6.71k £6.77k £7.53k
Total expenditure £4.88k £501 £9.70k £6.57k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A