Financial history FRIENDS OF BRIMBLE HILL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £8.01k £8.00k £4.08k £1.01k £1.14k
Total expenditure £22.13k £667 £13.43k £3.65k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A