Trustees CHARLTON PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1034974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Struan Kenton Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Pietje Tavener Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Beverley Riggs Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Amanda Bartholomew-Eason Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rebecca Gibbs Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Cathy Hamer Trustee 13 October 2016
None on record
Sheila Marsella-Brookes Trustee 30 September 2014
None on record