Accounts and annual returns JACK AND JILL PLAYGROUP (WOOLER)

Charity number: 1035016
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 04 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 25 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 21 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required