Financial history FRIENDS OF HEMBLINGTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.36k £3.60k £24.99k £12.30k £15.21k
Total expenditure £6.83k £4.32k £21.84k £4.97k £17.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A