Financial history BLUE COAT CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1035128
Charity reporting is up to date (247 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.68k £17.82k £13.29k £14.87k £25.95k
Total expenditure £5.51k £15.64k £14.95k £15.16k £16.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A