Financial history HOUNSLOW FESTIVAL OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DANCE

Charity number: 1035333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.67k £0 £5.91k £6.76k £13.37k
Total expenditure £5.61k £494 £8.48k £2.98k £7.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A