Accounts and annual returns QUINTON PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1035481
Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window