Financial history PEAK PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035604
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £15.27k £16.53k £19.97k £22.99k £15.42k
Total expenditure £17.37k £16.98k £22.51k £16.01k £14.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £13.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A